Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father José Aparecido Hergesse, C.R.

Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Vitória, Espirito Santo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1957 BornParanapanema
7 May 198325.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
26 Jan 198527.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
4 May 201153.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
4 May 201153.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Assava
9 Jun 201153.9ResignedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Vitória, Espirito Santo, Brazil
9 Jun 201153.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Assava

MicroData Summary for José Aparecido Hergesse:
Priest José Aparecido Hergesse C.R. (born ) Former Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Vitória

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Vitória.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 11 May 2011
  • r: CB, 9 Jun 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013