Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georg Friedrich Greiffenclau von Vollrads

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1573BornWolzath
15 Sep 161643.0SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
31 Jul 161743.8ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
8 Sep 161845.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Oct 162653.1SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
28 Apr 162753.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
15 Aug 162753.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
6 Jul 162955.8DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Friedrich Greiffenclau von Vollrads:
Archbishop Georg Friedrich Greiffenclau von Vollrads (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

  • a priest for 10.8 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 245, and Page 373
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015