Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanisław Grochowski

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Dec 1633AppointedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
25 Jul 1634Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
1 Mar 1645DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Grochowski:
Archbishop Stanisław Grochowski (died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a bishop for 10.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,351

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013