Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Gómez de Lamadrid, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1529²Born
27 Mar 157748.2AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
13 Jun 157849.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Badajoz, Spain
15 Aug 160172.6DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Gómez de Lamadrid
Archbishop Diego Gómez de Lamadrid O.SS.T. (born 1529, died ) Bishop of Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlacePotes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 225, and Page 266
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 88, Number 536
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1577, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast