Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger of Gloucester

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Mar 1164AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
23 Aug 1164Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
9 Aug 1179DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Roger of Gloucester
Bishop Roger of Gloucester (died ) Bishop of Worcester

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 49
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018