Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paweł Giżycki

Deceased

Bishop of Płock


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1400¹BornGizyce k. Sochaczewa
21 Aug 143939.6AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
27 Dec 143940.0Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
28 Jan 146363.1DiedBishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paweł Giżycki:
Bishop Paweł Giżycki (died ) Bishop of Płock

  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 217
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,404
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,748

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013