Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rogerius Giacobetti

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1656BornAssisi
9 Jun 169135.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 171559.2AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
16 Jun 171559.3Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
3 May 171660.1DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Rogerius Giacobetti:
Bishop Rogerius Giacobetti (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

  • a priest for 24.9 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013