Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dalmacio del Mur

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Nov 1415AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
17 Jan 1419AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
18 Apr 1431AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
12 Sep 1456DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Dalmacio del Mur:
Archbishop Dalmacio del Mur (died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 113
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 479, and Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013