Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques Gélu

Deceased

Archbishop of Embrun, France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Nov 1414AppointedArchbishop of Tours, France
30 Jul 1427AppointedArchbishop of Embrun, France
7 Sep 1432DiedArchbishop of Embrun, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques Gélu
Archbishop Jacques Gélu (died ) Archbishop of Embrun

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 503, and Page 234
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 May 2019

Quantcast