Catholic-Hierarchy DC

García Cardinal de Loaysa y Mendoza, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1478²Born
23 May 151840.3AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Jun 152446.4AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
29 Sep 152446.7Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
9 Mar 153052.1Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 153052.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
23 Feb 153254.1AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
21 May 153961.3AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
22 Apr 154668.3DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for García de Loaysa y Mendoza
García Cardinal de Loaysa y Mendoza O.P. (born 1478, died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTalavera de la Reina, Archdiocese of Toledo
Ordained BishopSan Pablo des dominicains, Church, Valladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid
Death PlaceMadrid

  • a bishop for 21.5 years
  • a cardinal for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Mar 1530
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,381
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 37, Number 168
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 265, and Page 211
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 296
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,524, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast