Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso de Fonseca y Ulloa

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1475¹Born
4 Aug 150732.5AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
31 Dec 152348.9AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
4 Feb 153459.0DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Fonseca y Ulloa
Archbishop Alfonso de Fonseca y Ulloa (born 1475, died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Compostela, Archdiocese of Santiago de Compostela
Death PlaceToledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 24, Number 58
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 173, and Page 314
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,507, Number 17*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast