Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Caballini

Deceased

Bishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1716Born
11 Oct 173923.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Oct 173923.2Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 177356.6AppointedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
9 May 177356.8Ordained BishopBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia
25 May 178265.8DiedBishop of Senj (-Modruš), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Caballini
Bishop Giovanni Battista Caballini (born , died ) Bishop of Senj (-Modruš)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNovi

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 372
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast