Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Galilei

Deceased

Bishop of Cortona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹Born
28 May 165747.4AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
3 Jun 165747.4Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
15 Jan 167767.0DiedBishop of Cortona, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Galilei
Bishop Filippo Galilei (born 1610, died ) Bishop of Cortona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}
Ordained BishopSanta Lucia in Selci, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCortona, Diocese of Cortona
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Cortona, Diocese of Cortona

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 166
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1657, Number 22
  • ob/c2/d: AT, 5 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 6 Nov 2018

Quantcast