Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Gagliani, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1662³Born
21 Jan 171552.5AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
27 Jan 171552.5Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
Aug 1715³53.1DiedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Gagliani
Bishop Antonio Gagliani O.F.M. Conv. (born , died Aug 1715) Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 398
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1715, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast