Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Filhol

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix, France


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Mar 1530AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Aix, France
4 May 1533Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Aix, France
22 Jan 1541SucceededArchbishop of Aix, France
2 Dec 1550DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine Filhol
Archbishop Antoine Filhol (died ) Archbishop of Aix

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Sauveur, Aix en Provence, Archdiocese of Aix

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1533, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast