Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father John Fetsco, C.Ss.R. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada

Priest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1929Born
19 Aug 195020.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 May 195626.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
22 Nov 199666.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada
14 Feb 200171.1CeasedApostolic Administrator of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada
23 Jun 200979.5DiedPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer

MicroData Summary for John Fetsco
Father John Fetsco C.Ss.R. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto

EventPlace
Birth PlacePringle, PA
Death PlaceUnionville, Ont.
Buried Place (Original)Dallas, PA

  • a priest for 53.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 5 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast