Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Fernández Temiño

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532²Born
11 Sep 158149.6AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
19 Mar 1582³50.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
29 Aug 159058.6DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Fernández Temiño
Bishop Pedro Fernández Temiño (born 1532, died ) Bishop of Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValdivielso, Archdiocese of Burgos
Death PlaceBonilla de la Sierra

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 92
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,537
  • b/c23: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 94, Number 585
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1582, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast