Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonius Lucurri (Cogorno), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Brugnato, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1548SelectedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
5 Mar 1548ConfirmedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
1565²ResignedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
1565²AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Parma, Italy
1567²ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Parma, Italy
1579²DiedBishop Emeritus of Brugnato, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonius Lucurri (Cogorno)
Bishop Antonius Lucurri (Cogorno) O.P. (died 1579) Bishop Emeritus of Brugnato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSestri Levante, Archdiocese of Genova
Death PlaceSestri Levante, Archdiocese of Genova
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria Annunciata, Convent, Sestri Levante, Archdiocese of Genova

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 141
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 3*
  • p212/loc: CB, 2 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 3 Jun 2020

Quantcast