Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Bautista Ferrer y Castro

Deceased

Bishop of Lugo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1694BornValencia
23 Aug 174550.8AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
21 Nov 174551.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lugo, Spain
12 Apr 174853.4DiedBishop of Lugo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Bautista Ferrer y Castro:
Bishop Juan Bautista Ferrer y Castro (born , died ) Bishop of Lugo

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 64, Number 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015