Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Ferreri

Deceased

Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Nov 1550AppointedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
1561¹ResignedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
16 Oct 1564AppointedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
2 Jun 1578AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
1579²DiedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Ferreri
Bishop Vincenzo Ferreri (died 1579) Bishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 249, and Page 323
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1550, Number 47*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast