Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Aloisio Farfusola

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mylopotamos, Greece


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹Born
3 Apr 162841.2AppointedBishop of Mylopotamos, Greece
30 Apr 162841.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mylopotamos, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Aloisio Farfusola
Bishop Giovanni Aloisio Farfusola (born 1587) Bishop Emeritus of Mylopotamos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona, Italy
Ordained BishopSanta Cecilia, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 242
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,628, Number 36
  • ob/c2: AT, 18 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,072

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast