Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques d’Espinay-Durestal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rennes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1423Born
7 Jan 145027.0AppointedBishop of Saint-Malo, France
25 Apr 145027.3AppointedBishop of Rennes, France
Oct 148158.7ResignedBishop of Rennes, France
Jan 148259.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Rennes, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques d’Espinay-Durestal
Bishop Jacques d’Espinay-Durestal (born 1423, died Jan 1482) Bishop Emeritus of Rennes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChampeaux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 221, and Page 183
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1450, Number 2*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast