Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Llupiá y Roger, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of León


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1684³BornBarcelona
18 Jun 170723.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Saint Benedict
4 Dec 170723.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
27 Oct 173551.6SelectedBishop of León, Spain
19 Dec 173551.8ConfirmedBishop of León, Spain
1736²51.8Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
21 Nov 175268.7DiedBishop of León, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José de Llupiá y Roger:
Bishop José de Llupiá y Roger O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of León

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 256
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 55, Number 241
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015