Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Charles Cardinal Erskine of Kellie

Deceased

Deacon of Roma {Rome}

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1739BornRome
23 Feb 180162.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
17 Jan 180363.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Mar 180364.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
22 Jan 180464.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Roma {Rome}, Italy
20 Mar 181172.1DiedDeacon of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Charles Erskine of Kellie:
Cardinal Charles Erskine of Kellie (born , died ) Deacon of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 10.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Feb 1801

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013