Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ralph d’Escures

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jun 1108AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
9 Aug 1108Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
26 Apr 1114AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
20 Oct 1122DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ralph d’Escures
Archbishop Ralph d’Escures (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 42
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 7
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 557

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast