Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Franziskus Cardinal Ehrle, S.J. †

Deceased

Librarian of the Vatican Library

Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio

Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archives


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1845BornIsny, Germany
24 Sep 187630.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
11 Dec 192277.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
11 Dec 192277.2Elevated to Cardinal
17 Apr 192983.5AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
17 Apr 192983.5AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
31 Mar 193488.5DiedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives

MicroData Summary for Franziskus Ehrle:
Cardinal Franziskus Ehrle S.J. (born , died ) Librarian of Vatican Library

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a cardinal for 11.3 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013