Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Egidio Cardinal da Viterbo, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello

Bishop of Lanciano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1472Born
148816.0ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
Jun 150735.4AppointedPrior General of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
1 Jul 151745.5Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151745.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
10 Jul 151745.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
Feb 151846.0ResignedPrior General of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
2 Dec 152351.9AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
10 Jan 152452.0Ordained BishopBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
8 Aug 152452.6AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
9 May 153058.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
19 Dec 153058.9ResignedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
19 Dec 153058.9AppointedAdministrator of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
10 Apr 153260.2AppointedBishop of Lanciano, Italy
12 Nov 153260.8DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Egidio da Viterbo
Egidio Cardinal da Viterbo O.E.S.A. (born 1472, died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanepina, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
  • a cardinal for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 177, and Page 218
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1524, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast