Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Éder

Deceased

Bishop of Quimper


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Aug 1539AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Quimper, France
Jul 1540³SucceededBishop of Quimper, France
25 Dec 1541Ordained BishopBishop of Quimper, France
22 May 1546DiedBishop of Quimper, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Éder:
Bishop Guillaume Éder (died ) Bishop of Quimper

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013