Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardo Cardinal Dovizi da Bibbiena

Deceased

Administrator of Coutances, France

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1470Born
23 Sep 151343.1Elevated to Cardinal
29 Sep 151343.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
151443.4AppointedAdministrator of Pozzuoli, Italy
4 Nov 151747.2AppointedAdministrator of Coria, Spain
9 Sep 151949.1AppointedAdministrator of Coutances, France
9 Nov 152050.2DiedAdministrator of Coutances, France

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Dovizi da Bibbiena (VIAF: 12335069)
Bernardo Cardinal Dovizi da Bibbiena (born , died ) Administrator of Coutances

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBibbiena

  • a cardinal for 7.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Sep 1513
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 249, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018