Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Andrea Doria

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1722Born
28 Apr 174825.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 May 175936.5AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
4 Jun 175936.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
17 Sep 179471.8DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Andrea Doria
Bishop Benedetto Andrea Doria (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRogliano

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 65
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast