Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barthélemy de Donadieu de Griet

Deceased

Bishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1592Born
6 Oct 162533.1AppointedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
8 Dec 162533.2Ordained BishopBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
12 Nov 163745.2DiedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France

MicroData Summary for Barthélemy de Donadieu de Griet
Bishop Barthélemy de Donadieu de Griet (born , died ) Bishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontequière-Volvestre

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 163
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast