Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert d’Oignies

Deceased

Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1520¹Born
6 Jul 156545.5AppointedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
21 Oct 156545.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium
25 Aug 157454.6DiedBishop of Tournai {Doornik}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilbert d’Oignies
Bishop Gilbert d’Oignies (born 1520, died ) Bishop of Tournai {Doornik}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLille
Ordained BishopS. Amand, Abbey
Death PlaceCourtrai

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast