Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António de Matos de Noronha

Deceased

Bishop of Elvas


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Nov 1591AppointedBishop of Elvas, Portugal
15 Mar 1592Ordained BishopBishop of Elvas, Portugal
16 Nov 1610DiedBishop of Elvas, Portugal

MicroData Summary for António de Matos de Noronha:
Bishop António de Matos de Noronha (died ) Bishop of Elvas

  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 192
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,202
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,296

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013