Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard de La Tour

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Papoul, France


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Oct 1344AppointedBishop of Tulle, France
19 Feb 1347AppointedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France
9 Aug 1361DiedBishop of Saint-Papoul, France

MicroData Summary for Bernard de La Tour
Bishop Bernard de La Tour (died ) Bishop of Saint-Papoul

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 505, and Page 390

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 8 Apr 2020

Quantcast