Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François (Lopis) de La Fare, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Riez, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹Born
15 Sep 162541.7AppointedBishop of Riez, France
26 Oct 162541.8Ordained BishopBishop of Riez, France
28 Sep 162844.7DiedBishop of Riez, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François (Lopis) de La Fare
Bishop François (Lopis) de La Fare O.M. (born 1584, died ) Bishop of Riez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarpentras

  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 294
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast