Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de los Cobos Molina

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Aug 1559AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
4 Sep 1560AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
8 Sep 1565DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego de los Cobos Molina:
Bishop Diego de los Cobos Molina (died ) Bishop of Jaén

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 69, Number 399
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 92, and Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014