Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Dias de Escobar, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ajaccio

Titular Bishop of Megara


Events

DateEventTitle
25 May 1410AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
4 Sep 1422AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
5 May 1428ResignedBishop of Ajaccio, France
5 May 1428AppointedTitular Bishop of Megara

MicroData Summary for André Dias de Escobar:
Bishop André Dias de Escobar O.S.B. , Bishop Emeritus of Ajaccio

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 71, and Page 333
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 190

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014