Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maynard de Contrariis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Comacchio


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Apr 1414AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
1431¹ResignedBishop of Cervia, Italy
21 Nov 1431AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
23 Sep 1436Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maynard de Contrariis:
Bishop Maynard de Contrariis Bishop Emeritus of Comacchio

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 133
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,729
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 183

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013