Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego Deza Tello

Deceased

Bishop of Jaén, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Apr 1554AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
26 Apr 1566AppointedBishop of Coria, Spain
11 Sep 1577AppointedBishop of Jaén, Spain
13 Sep 1579DiedBishop of Jaén, Spain

MicroData Summary for Diego Deza Tello
Bishop Diego Deza Tello (died ) Bishop of Jaén

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Death PlaceSevilla, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 150, and Page 160
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 203
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 65, Number 373
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1554, Number 3*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast