Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arnaud Sabatier

Deceased

Bishop of Riez


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jun 1322AppointedBishop of Bologna, Italy
27 Oct 1322Ordained BishopBishop of Bologna, Italy
1 Oct 1330AppointedBishop of Riez, France
5 Aug 1334DiedBishop of Riez, France

MicroData Summary for Arnaud Sabatier:
Bishop Arnaud Sabatier (died ) Bishop of Riez

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 140, and Page 417
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,874

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013