Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal della Porta

Deceased

Prefect of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1746Born
23 Feb 180154.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
23 Feb 180154.2Elevated to Cardinal
20 Sep 180255.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
6 Dec 180357.0AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
5 Sep 181265.8DiedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Girolamo della Porta
Girolamo Cardinal della Porta (born , died ) Prefect of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGubbio, Diocese of Gubbio, Italy

  • a cardinal for 11.5 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast