Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fulvio Giulio Cardinal della Corgna, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1517BornPerugia
5 Mar 155032.3AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
20 Nov 155134.0Elevated to Cardinal
4 Dec 155134.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
22 Mar 155335.3ResignedBishop of Perugia, Italy
22 Mar 155335.3AppointedAdministrator of Spoleto, Italy
155537.1ResignedAdministrator of Spoleto, Italy
29 May 155537.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
20 Sep 155739.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
18 May 156244.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
6 Sep 156446.8AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
7 Feb 156547.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
30 Jan 156648.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
3 Mar 156749.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Adriano al Foro
5 May 157456.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
5 May 157456.5ResignedBishop of Perugia, Italy
5 Dec 158063.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
2 Mar 158365.3DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary for Fulvio Giulio della Corgna:
Cardinal Fulvio Giulio della Corgna O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a cardinal for 31.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Nov 1551
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 272, and Page 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014