Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Borja

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629BornBogotá
8 Feb 166839.1SelectedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
17 Sep 166839.7ConfirmedBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
1671²42.0Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
20 May 167950.4SelectedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
4 Sep 167950.7ConfirmedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
13 Apr 168960.3DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Borja:
Bishop Francisco de Borja (died ) Bishop of Trujillo

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,850

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 30 Oct 2013