Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gerolamo de Caro

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Nazareth


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Mar 1521AppointedBishop of Monteverde, Italy
5 Feb 1526Ordained BishopBishop of Monteverde, Italy
3 Jul 1531AppointedTitular Bishop of Cannae
Nov 1536³AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
16 Feb 1552ResignedTitular Archbishop of Nazareth
8 Nov 1560DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Nazareth

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo de Caro
Archbishop Gerolamo de Caro (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Nazareth

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Laurent in Piscibus, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 254, and Page 250
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1526, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jun 2018

Quantcast