Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard d’Elbčne

Deceased

Bishop of Nîmes, France


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1559AppointedBishop of Lodčve, France
1560¹ResignedBishop of Lodčve, France
13 Jun 1561AppointedBishop of Nîmes, France
28 Mar 1569DiedBishop of Nîmes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard d’Elbčne
Bishop Bernard d’Elbčne (died ) Bishop of Nîmes

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 227, and Page 255
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1559, Number 1*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast