Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal degli Atti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateEventTitle
30 May 1348AppointedArchbishop of Corf¨, Greece
17 Sep 1348AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
17 Apr 1353AppointedBishop of Monte Cassino, Italy
18 Mar 1355AppointedBishop of Firenze, Italy
23 Dec 1356AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
23 Dec 1356Elevated to Cardinal
25 Aug 1361³DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marco

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco degli Atti
Francesco Cardinal degli Atti (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTodi, Diocese of Todi, Italy
Death PlacePont de Sorgues, Vaucluse
Buried Place (Original)Celestines, Church, Avignon

  • a cardinal for 4.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1356
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 250, and Page 209
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 195, and Page 169

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Aug 2021

Quantcast