Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henry Murdac, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England


Events

DateEventTitle
1120¹ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
24 Jul 1147AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
7 Dec 1147Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
14 Oct 1153DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henry Murdac
Archbishop Henry Murdac O. Cist. (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 46
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 99
  • b/c2: CB, 15 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016