Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard de Dainville

Deceased

Bishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Nov 1361AppointedBishop of Arras, France
1362²Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
11 Oct 1368AppointedBishop of Thérouanne, France
6 Jun 1371AppointedBishop of Cambrai, France
18 Jun 1378DiedBishop of Cambrai, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerard de Dainville
Bishop Gerard de Dainville (died ) Bishop of Cambrai

  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 116, and Page 351
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 160
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,469

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 21 Jun 2020

Quantcast