Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Cuzzolini

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1624BornCosenza
3 Jan 164924.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Feb 167550.8SelectedBishop of Oria, Italy
9 Sep 167551.4ConfirmedBishop of Oria, Italy
25 Feb 169772.9AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
Aug 1698³74.3DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Cuzzolini:
Bishop Carlo Cuzzolini (born , died Aug 1698) Bishop of Pozzuoli

  • a priest for 49.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 325, and Page 399
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015