Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert de Croixmare

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1483AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
5 May 1483Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rouen, France
18 Jul 1493DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Robert de Croixmare
Archbishop Robert de Croixmare (died ) Archbishop of Rouen

EventPlace
Ordained BishopParis, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 10.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 225
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,310
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1483, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast